IN SB0356 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Healthy food finance. Establishes the healthy food financing fund (fund) and healthy food financing program (program) under the administration of the Indiana housing and community development authority (IHCDA). Provides that the purpose of the fund is to provide financing in the form of loans or grants for projects that increase the availability of fresh and nutritious food in underserved communities. Defines an "underserved community" as a census tract determined to be an area with low supermarket access: (1) by the United States Department of Agriculture; or (2) as identified through a methodology used by another healthy food initiative. Provides that the IHCDA may contract with one or more nonprofit organizations or community development financial institutions to administer the program through a public-private partnership. Provides that an applicant for a grant or a loan must demonstrate the capacity to successfully implement the project and the ability to repay the loan. Provides that an applicant for a grant or a loan must agree to satisfy certain conditions. Requires the IHCDA to monitor projects receiving financing and submit a report annually to the legislative council that includes the number and types of jobs created, and the health initiatives associated with the program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healthy food finance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-28SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2020-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Shackleford
2020-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 46, nays 4
2020-01-27SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23SenateSenator Melton added as third author
2020-01-23SenateSenator Breaux added as second author
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-13SenateAuthored by Senator Merritt

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback