IN SB0356 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Work ethic certification and grants. Provides that a school corporation may establish a work ethic certification program under which a student who develops skills necessary for success in higher education or employment receives a work ethic certificate upon graduation. Provides that the state board of education, in consultation with the workforce innovation council, may adopt rules to: (1) establish model criteria for a work ethic certification program; and (2) develop a standard work ethic certificate.
Title
Work ethic certification and grants. Provides that a school corporation may establish a work ethic certification program under which a student who develops skills necessary for success in higher education or employment receives a work ethic certificate upon graduation. Provides that the state board of education, in consultation with the workforce innovation council, may adopt rules to: (1) establish model criteria for a work ethic certification program; and (2) develop a standard work ethic certificate.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representatives Stemler, Clere, Goodin added as cosponsorss |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Representative Davisson added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 37, nays 13 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senator Steele removed as second author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |