IN SB0355 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Psychology interjurisdictional compact. Establishes the psychology interjurisdictional compact concerning interjurisdictional telepsychology and the temporary authorization to practice psychology in another compact state. Sets forth requirements of a compact state. Sets forth the duties of the psychology interjurisdictional compact commission.
Title
Psychology interjurisdictional compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Statutory Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Bacon |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Leising added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Crider |