IN SB0355 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals, effective July 1, 2011, provisions applicable to adoptions finalized before January 1, 1994, that prohibit the release of identifying adoption information unless a consent to release the information is on file. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2011, identifying adoption information may be released unless a nonrelease is on file, regardless of when the adoption was filed. (Under current law, this provision applies only to adoptions filed after December 31, 1993.)
Title
Release of identifying adoption information.
Sponsors
Sen. Vi Simpson [D] | Sen. Connie Sipes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-12 | Authored by Senators Simpson and Sipes |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2010&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0355 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2010/IN/IN0355.1.html |