IN SB0352 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband development. Requires the office of community and rural affairs (office) to establish a process to be used before each formal submission of applications for grants from the rural broadband fund (fund) in which the office will: (1) invite any prospective grant applicant to submit a letter of intent identifying all addresses and census blocks that the applicant intends to include in a grant application; and (2) make all addresses and census blocks submitted in letters of intent publicly available for a period of time, during which eligible broadband service providers will have the opportunity to challenge a listed address or census block. Provides that challenges under the new process are to be based on the asserted deployment of "minimum broadband Internet" (defined as a terrestrial connection to the Internet that provides an actual speed of at least 25 megabits per second downstream and at least three megabits per second upstream) at a specific address. Specifies that the process established is to precede and remain distinct from the statutory procedures for actual grant applications. Provides that the department of transportation (INDOT) may require a private entity to agree, as a condition of INDOT leasing a right-of-way to the private entity, that facilities constructed or installed by the private entity in or under the right-of-way, which if removed would: (1) cause irreparable soil disturbance; or (2) have a detrimental effect on INDOT's facilities or on the facilities of other utilities; will be considered abandoned without additional consideration, upon the private entity's written notice to INDOT. Provides that upon being abandoned, a facility may no longer be used for any purpose by any public or private entity.
Title
Broadband development.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Stacey Donato [R] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Ethan Manning [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Law 121 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 435: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 355: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2021-04-01 | House | Amendment #1 (Manning) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Manning |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 193: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senators Donato and Leising added as coauthors |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Garten added as coauthor |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Houchin |