IN SB0351 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appraisal management companies. Provides that an appraisal management company that engages a real estate appraiser as an independent contractor as described in the statute concerning appraisal management companies to perform an appraisal shall pay the real estate appraiser for the appraisal not later than: (1) the deadline indicated by the payment terms set forth in: (A) the contract or agreement between the appraisal management company and the real estate appraiser; or (B) the real estate appraiser's invoice, if such a contract or agreement: (i) does not exist; or (ii) exists but does not specify any payment terms; or (2) 45
Title
Appraisal management companies. Provides that an appraisal management company that engages a real estate appraiser as an independent contractor as described in the statute concerning appraisal management companies to perform an appraisal shall pay the real estate appraiser for the appraisal not later than: (1) the deadline indicated by the payment terms set forth in: (A) the contract or agreement between the appraisal management company and the real estate appraiser; or (B) the real estate appraiser's invoice, if such a contract or agreement: (i) does not exist; or (ii) exists but does not specify any payment terms; or (2) 45
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] |
Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 15 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-21 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Morris, Burton and DeVon |
2018-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Miller D |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 30, nays 19 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |