IN SB0351 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Senator Lanane added as coauthor.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Senator Lanane added as coauthor.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the definition of "qualified service member" for purposes of the military family relief fund law to mean an individual who is: (1) an Indiana resident; (2) a member of the armed forces or the National Guard; and (3) serving on active duty. Removes the provision that limits to three years the time during which an Indiana qualified service member is eligible to receive assistance from the military family relief fund.
Title
Military family relief fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Allen Paul [R] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Sen. Richard Young [D] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Alting added as third author. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as second author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paul. |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/351/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/7/4/b774f8ac/SB0351.01.INTR.pdf |