IN SB0351 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a license for nonresident roe harvesters and dealers. Allows the natural resources commission to establish the minimum application fees for nonresident roe harvester and dealer licenses. Gives residents of Indiana priority in receiving roe harvester and dealer licenses.
Title
Roe harvester and dealer licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-02-01 | Cosponsor: Rep. Davisson | |
2012-02-01 | House sponsor: Rep. Cheatham | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to the House | |
2012-02-01 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 176: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 1 (R. Young), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-24 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-20 | Senator Mishler added as second author | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Senator R. Young |