IN SB0350 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Loss insurance. Allows the state board of animal health to purchase insurance to cover the loss and damages to the state of Indiana related to a prevalent animal disease incident.
Title
Loss insurance. Allows the state board of animal health to purchase insurance to cover the loss and damages to the state of Indiana related to a prevalent animal disease incident.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] |
Rep. Melanie Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public Law 67 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 394: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-04-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 372: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Wright |
2019-02-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehe |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |