IN SB0350 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal history background checks for home health workers. Requires a home health agency or personal services agency to obtain a national criminal history background check or an expanded criminal history check on employees. (Current law requires a limited criminal history record unless certain circumstances exist that would require a national criminal history background check or an expanded criminal history check.)
Title
Criminal history background checks for home health workers. Requires a home health agency or personal services agency to obtain a national criminal history background check or an expanded criminal history check on employees. (Current law requires a limited criminal history record unless certain circumstances exist that would require a national criminal history background check or an expanded criminal history check.)
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Greg Beumer [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Rep. Charlie Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 51 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 339: yeas 44, nays 0 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-02-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-02-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2016-02-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-22 | House | Representatives Porter and Brown, C. added as cosponsors |
2016-02-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Thompson |
2016-01-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Beumer |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as second author |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |