IN SB0350 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
East Chicago school board. Reduces the number of members of the governing body of the School City of East Chicago from nine to five, beginning January 1, 2017. Provides that if a vacancy occurs on the governing body before January 1, 2017, the vacancy shall not be filled unless the vacancy reduces the number of members to fewer than five. Provides that three members of the governing body are elected from districts and two members of the governing body are elected at large by all the voters of the city. Repeals and provides for the expiration of statutes consistent with
Title
East Chicago school board. Reduces the number of members of the governing body of the School City of East Chicago from nine to five, beginning January 1, 2017. Provides that if a vacancy occurs on the governing body before January 1, 2017, the vacancy shall not be filled unless the vacancy reduces the number of members to fewer than five. Provides that three members of the governing body are elected from districts and two members of the governing body are elected at large by all the voters of the city. Repeals and provides for the expiration of statutes consistent with
Sponsors
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Rep. Charlie Brown [D] |
Rep. Earl Harris [D] | Rep. William Fine [R] | Rep. Harold Slager [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representatives Harris, Fine, Slager added as cosponsors |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Brown, C. added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senator Walker removed as coauthor |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second author |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senator Walker added as coauthor |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Elections |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Randolph |