IN SB0350 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions concerning deductions to retail merchants under the E85 reimbursement program. Provides that a motor fuel retail dealer is immune from civil liability for property damages that result from the use in a motor of a motor fuel that was not compatible for use in the motor and was dispensed by the retail dealer, if the incompatible motor fuel: (1) conformed to standards and specifications for the sale of the motor fuel as established under applicable federal and state laws; (2) was selected for use in the motor by a person other than the retail dealer or an employee or agent of the retail dealer; and (3) was dispensed from a motor fuel pump that conspicuously displayed a label that correctly identified the type of motor fuel that was dispensed from the pump. Adds requirements applying to membership on the corn marketing council (council). Changes the date by which a petition for candidacy to the council may be filed. Provides that the council operates on the basis of its own fiscal year. (Current law requires the council to operate on a state fiscal year basis.) Establishes a formula to determine the maximum administrative expenses of the council. Provides that the cost of processing refunds and the cost of applying for grants are not administrative expenses. Requires a first purchaser of corn to remit the corn sale assessment within 30 days after collection. Requires a first purchaser that is not subject to assessment to sign and date an exemption form. Establishes an assessment refund schedule based upon the amount owed. Makes a technical change.
Title
Corn marketing council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-02-09 | Representative Friend added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-01 | House sponsor: Rep. Lehe | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to the House | |
2012-02-01 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 175: yeas 46 and nays 3 | |
2012-01-26 | Senator R. Young added as coauthor | |
2012-01-26 | Senator Leising added as second author | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-24 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Senator Gard |