IN SB0347 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Work sharing unemployment benefits program. Establishes a work sharing unemployment insurance program (program). Requires an employer that desires to participate in the program to submit a work sharing plan for approval by the commissioner of the department of workforce development. Establishes the work sharing benefit as equal to an affected employee's unemployment benefit reduced by a percentage equal to the percentage of the employee's normal weekly work hours that the employee works under the approved work sharing plan. Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Work sharing unemployment benefits program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-07SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2023-02-02SenateSenator Dernulc added as coauthor
2023-01-31SenateSenator Yoder added as coauthor
2023-01-26SenateSenator Perfect added as coauthor
2023-01-24SenateSenator Walker K added as coauthor
2023-01-19SenateSenator Buchanan added as third author
2023-01-17SenateSenator Niezgodski added as second author
2023-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2023-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Bassler

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback