IN SB0347 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation network companies. Requires a transportation network company (TNC) to have a permit issued by the Indiana department of transportation to provide TNC services in Indiana. Establishes requirements that a TNC must satisfy in order to be issued a permit. Provides that a person that violates TNC requirements commits a Class A infraction. Provides that a person that violates TNC requirements related to accessibility is subject to an additional penalty of up to $10,000. Establishes the accessible transportation fund to provide grants to TNCs that provide accessible services. Deposits the additional penalties in the fund.
Title
Transportation network companies. Requires a transportation network company (TNC) to have a permit issued by the Indiana department of transportation to provide TNC services in Indiana. Establishes requirements that a TNC must satisfy in order to be issued a permit. Provides that a person that violates TNC requirements commits a Class A infraction. Provides that a person that violates TNC requirements related to accessibility is subject to an additional penalty of up to $10,000. Establishes the accessible transportation fund to provide grants to TNCs that provide accessible services. Deposits the additional penalties in the fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Representative Lehman added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Yoder) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second author |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Yoder |