IN SB0346 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financial institutions and consumer credit. For purposes of the statutes governing: (1) first lien mortgage transactions; (2) the Uniform Consumer Credit Code; and (3) financial institutions; changes references to federal laws within those statutes from federal laws as in effect on December 31, 2019, to federal laws as in effect on December 31, 2020. Amends the statute concerning loans made by a credit union to the credit union's members to eliminate certain requirements with respect to loans secured by real estate. Amends the definition of "check" for purposes of the statute governing licensed cashers of checks to remove a reference to a "personal money order".
Title
Financial institutions and consumer credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Public Law 54 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2021-03-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 316: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2021-02-09 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 90: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as third author |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bassler |