IN SB0345 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Returned to the Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Returned to the Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sale of bonds at a negotiated sale. Permits all counties, cities, towns, townships, and school corporations to sell bonds at a negotiated sale. Requires the department of local government finance to post on its web site information that explains the differences between a competitive public sale of bonds and a negotiated sale of bonds.
Title
Sale of bonds at a negotiated sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R] |
Rep. Renee Pack [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-03-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 315: yeas 90, nays 3 |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-03-25 | House | Amendment #2 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-03-25 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-09 | House | Representatives Thompson and Pack R added as cosponsors |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2021-02-08 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as third author |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bassler |