IN SB0345 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 122
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Use of restraints and seclusion in schools.
Title
Use of restraints and seclusion in schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 122 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 476: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 452: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Representative Porter added as cosponsor |
2013-03-21 | House | Representative Summers removed as cosponsor |
2013-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. Heaton, Summers and Battles |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Clere |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 49 and nays 1 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Head), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2013-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |