IN SB0343 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agritourism activities. Specifies that "agritourism activity" includes camping, canoeing, kayaking, tubing on a river, and winter sports activities, including activities that take place on a facility or on grounds used for or in connection with winter sports activities. Provides that failure to post a warning sign or provide a warning notice does not create a cause of action against an agritourism provider. Allows the use of an electronic signature to sign a contract or release in connection with engaging in an agritourism activity.
Title
Agritourism activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Eric Bassler [R] |
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Law 63 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 268: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Wesco added as cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 65, nays 25 |
2022-02-14 | House | Amendment #1 (Miller D) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-14 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Speedy and Bartels |
2022-01-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Miller D |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Koch added as third author |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rogers |