IN SB0342 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher hiring. Requires a school corporation, charter school, or nonpublic school to consider using a more comprehensive expanded criminal history background check for employment. Repeals current law concerning a school corporation or charter school's employment of, or contracting with, certain individuals, and establishes a new section that: (1) prohibits a school corporation, charter school, or state accredited nonpublic school from employing or contracting with specified individuals; (2) after June 30, 2023, allows a school corporation, charter school, or state accredited nonpublic school to employ or contract with certain other individuals with a majority vote of the school board, or the equivalent for a charter school, or with a notification of the appointing authority. Specifies that "misconduct" includes certain specified acts. Requires a school corporation, charter school, or state accredited nonpublic school that receives a reference request from another school to disclose specified incidents to the requesting school. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher hiring.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01SenatePublic Law 110
2023-05-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2023-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2023-04-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2023-04-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 355: yeas 48, nays 0
2023-04-06SenateMotion to concur filed
2023-03-31HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2023-03-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 331: yeas 90, nays 0
2023-03-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-03-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-03-13HouseRepresentative Cash B added as cosponsor
2023-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2023-02-07SenateReferred to the House
2023-02-06SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Behning
2023-02-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 70: yeas 49, nays 0
2023-02-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2023-02-02SenateAmendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
2023-01-30SenateSenator Sandlin added as second author
2023-01-26SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2023-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2023-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Freeman

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback