IN SB0342 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 03/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 03/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain procedures for taking a bodily substance sample do not apply if the sample is taken in a hospital.
Title
Bodily substance samples.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 36 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 253: Yeas 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Representative Welch added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Wyss added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Koch | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Pierce | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 152: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Simpson added as second author | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Lanane |