IN SB0340 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Imagination library. Establishes the Indiana imagination library. Provides that the state library shall administer the Indiana imagination library. Provides that the state library, in consultation with the department of education and the family and social services administration, shall either establish a statewide nonprofit organization or enter into an agreement with a statewide nonprofit organization to carry out the responsibilities related to statewide partnerships and programs. Requires that the statewide nonprofit organization manage the daily operations of and promote the program. Establishes the Indiana imagination library fund, which is nonreverting. Requires the state library, in conjunction with the statewide nonprofit organization, to review the program and report to the governor and the interim study committee on education by November 1 of each year, beginning November 1, 2023. Sets forth the information that the report must include.
Title
Imagination library.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Ledbetter C and O'Brien T |
2023-02-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Negele |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 43, nays 5 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senator Young M added as coauthor |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senators Rogers and Yoder added as coauthors |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker, Raatz, Leising |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATION, STATE DEPARTMENT OF
EDUCATION, Secretary of Education, State Department and Boards
FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
GOVERNOR
LIBRARIES
NONPROFIT CORPORATIONS AND ORGANIZATIONS
STUDY COMMITTEES
EDUCATION, Secretary of Education, State Department and Boards
FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
GOVERNOR
LIBRARIES
NONPROFIT CORPORATIONS AND ORGANIZATIONS
STUDY COMMITTEES