IN SB0340 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Section 18 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Makes conducting a community investigation by the parole board mandatory for certain individuals. Reduces the standard period of parole from two years to one year unless the parolee: (1) is a repeat parolee; (2) is being placed on parole for a conviction for a crime of violence; (3) is a sex offender; or (4) has violated a DOC rule in the six months prior to release. Provides that department of correction (department) rules concerning the maintenance of order and discipline among committed persons applies to persons placed in a community corrections program or assigned to a community transition program. Repeals a provision that requires a county that receives a grant from the department commissioner for the establishment and operation of a community corrections program to be charged a sum for certain persons committed to the department and confined in a state correctional facility. Requires that a community corrections plan must include a method to evaluate each component of the program to determine the overall use of department approved best practices for the program. Provides that the department must require community corrections programs to submit an evaluation of the use of department approved best practices for community correction program components in proposed budget requests. Provides that, for the purposes of the law concerning home detention, a home includes the residence of another person who is not part of the social unit formed by an offender's immediate family. Establishes certain standards and criteria for direct placement of offenders in community corrections programs. Specifies that, for purposes of the law concerning direct placement in community corrections programs: (1) "home" means the actual living area of the temporary or permanent residence of a person; and (2) a person who is placed in a community corrections program under the law is entitled to earn credit time. Allows a person to be deprived of credit time for violating a rule or condition of a community corrections program. Makes changes to the Indiana bail law concerning: (1) notices to sureties and bond agents; and (2) failure to appear. Provides that the requirement that courts include the costs of incarceration in a sentencing order expires June 30, 2012. Urges the legislative council to assign to the sentencing policy study committee the issue of whether a court should include the costs of incarceration in a sentencing order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole board duties, community corrections, and bail.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Section 18 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 17 effective 03/24/2010
2010-03-25 Sections 1 through 16 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 105
2010-03-24 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-19 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-16 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-12 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 326: Yeas 93, Nays 3
2010-03-12 Rules suspended
2010-03-12 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 297: Yeas 48, Nays 0
2010-03-11 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2010-03-05 Senator Steele removed as advisor
2010-03-02 House advisors appointed: VanHaaften, Foley and McClain
2010-03-02 House conferees appointed: L. Lawson and Leonard
2010-03-02 Senate advisors appointed: Steele, Randolph and Head
2010-03-02 Senate conferee appointed: Bray and Lanane
2010-03-02 Senate dissented from House amendments
2010-02-25 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 252: Yeas 96, Nays 0
2010-02-22 Amendment 3 (Foley), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-22 Amendment 2 (VanHaaften), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-22 Amendment 1 (L. Lawson), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-22 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-02-18 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Foley
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. L. Lawson
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 151: Yeas 49 and Nays 1
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-01 Senator Steele added as second author
2010-01-28 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2010-01-28 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-26 Senator Lanane added as coauthor
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback