IN SB0339 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
State gross retail tax.
Title
State gross retail tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. Pond, T. Brown and Zent |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Morris |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 50 and nays 0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |