IN SB0339 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Senator Arnold added as second author
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Combines the Lake Michigan marina development commission and the shoreline development commission into a new entity called the Lake Michigan marina and shoreline development commission. Provides that the Lake Michigan marina and shoreline development commission has the powers and duties specified for the two predecessor commissions. Specifies the membership of the Lake Michigan marina and shoreline development commission. Repeals statutes related to an executive committee in the laws governing the Lake Michigan marina and shoreline development commission. Provides that on July 1, 2010, the rights, duties, property, personnel, liabilities, and contractual obligations of the two predecessor commissions are transferred to the Lake Michigan marina and shoreline development commission. Makes conforming amendments to the statutes referring to the two predecessor commissions. Repeals superseded provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lake Michigan marina and shoreline development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-01 Senator Arnold added as second author
2010-01-28 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-26 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-19 Senator Landske added as coauthor
2010-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2010-01-12 Authored by Senator Tallian

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback