IN SB0338 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Prekindergarten pilot program eligibility. Amends requirements for eligibility for the prekindergarten pilot program (program) to include an eligible child who resides with: (1) a parent or guardian who is: (A) disabled and unable, as a result of the disability, to work or attend job training or an educational program; or (B) absent, for a limited period of time, from working or attending a job training or an education program as a result of an illness or caring for a family member; or (2) the eligible child's grandparent or great-grandparent. (Current law requires that, to be eligible for the program, an eligible child reside with a parent or guardian who is working, attending job training or an educational program, or actively seeking employment.) Provides that the office of the secretary of family and social services may not implement or continue to implement these new eligibility requirements if implementing or continuing to implement the provisions would result in the state losing federal funds under the federal Child Care and Development Fund (CCDF) grant program. Removes a provision specifying that priority under the program may be given to an eligible child if a parent or guardian of the eligible child is: (1) involved in activities that improve the parent's or guardian's education; or (2) involved in job training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prekindergarten pilot program eligibility. Amends requirements for eligibility for the prekindergarten pilot program (program) to include an eligible child who resides with: (1) a parent or guardian who is: (A) disabled and unable, as a result of the disability, to work or attend job training or an educational program; or (B) absent, for a limited period of time, from working or attending a job training or an education program as a result of an illness or caring for a family member; or (2) the eligible child's grandparent or great-grandparent. (Current law requires that, to be eligible for the program, an eligible child reside with a parent or guardian who is working, attending job training or an educational program, or actively seeking employment.) Provides that the office of the secretary of family and social services may not implement or continue to implement these new eligibility requirements if implementing or continuing to implement the provisions would result in the state losing federal funds under the federal Child Care and Development Fund (CCDF) grant program. Removes a provision specifying that priority under the program may be given to an eligible child if a parent or guardian of the eligible child is: (1) involved in activities that improve the parent's or guardian's education; or (2) involved in job training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-04SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2019-01-29SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-22SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-22SenateSenator Kruse added as third author
2019-01-22SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2019-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Melton

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback