IN SB0337 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of local government finance to develop criteria for making a one-time adjustment to allow a political subdivision to retain a portion of its levy and budget that would otherwise be reduced because of savings from a government reorganization or merger. Specifies that such an adjustment may not exceed 50% of the savings or reduction realized in the first full year of operation after the merger or reorganization. Specifies that the adjustment applies in the first year in which the adjustment is made and to all subsequent years. Provides that fiscal body of the reorganizing political subdivision or new township shall determine and certify to the department of local government finance the amount of the one time adjustment that the political subdivision or new township wishes to accept. Provides that in the case of a reorganization under the government modernization statutes, the amount of any one time adjustment accepted by a reorganized political subdivision must comply with the reorganization agreement.
Title
Local government merger and cooperation.
Sponsors
Sen. John Broden [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2010-01-28 | Cosponsors: Reps. Michael, Leonard and McClain | |
2010-01-28 | House sponsor: Rep. Bartlett | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: Yeas 48 and Nays 0 | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Holdman added as coauthor | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor | |
2010-01-26 | Amendment 2 (Head), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-26 | Amendment 1 (Head), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-26 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-19 | Senators Broden and Randolph added as coauthors | |
2010-01-19 | Senator Hershman added as second author | |
2010-01-19 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2010-01-12 | Authored by Senator Head |