IN SB0336 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Racketeering and fraud. Specifies that "racketeering activity", for purposes of the crime of corrupt business influence, includes certain forgery, fraud, and deception offenses.
Title
Racketeering and fraud.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Rep. John Young [R] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] |
Rep. Jeff Ellington [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 25 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative Ellington added as cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative Lauer added as cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 241: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senators Young M and Bohacek |