IN SB0336 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Business personal property tax exemption. Increases, from $40,000 to $80,000, the acquisition cost threshold for the business personal property tax exemption. Makes a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business personal property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Floor - (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Floor - (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 23 N: 66 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenatePublic Law 153
2021-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 478: yeas 68, nays 19
2021-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 470: yeas 38, nays 11
2021-04-21SenateSenators Doriot and Koch added as coauthors
2021-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2021-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2021-04-19HouseRepresentative Cherry added as conferee
2021-04-19HouseRepresentative Porter removed as conferee
2021-04-19HouseRepresentative Cherry removed as advisor
2021-04-15SenateSenator Baldwin added as conferee
2021-04-15SenateSenator Randolph Lonnie M removed as conferee
2021-04-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Cherry, Karickhoff and Pryor
2021-04-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Speedy and Porter
2021-04-08SenateSenate advisors appointed: Young M and Lanane
2021-04-08SenateSenate conferees appointed: Freeman and Randolph Lonnie M
2021-04-06SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2021-04-06SenateMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-01HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 341: yeas 68, nays 21
2021-03-30HouseRepresentatives Cherry and Judy added as cosponsors
2021-03-29HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 310: yeas 22, nays 67
2021-03-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2021-02-02SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Speedy
2021-02-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 37, nays 8
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Freeman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/336/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/b/2/2fb2bd19/SB0336.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/b/d/c2bd6843/SB0336.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/5/7/2657ad1b/SB0336.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/5/b/275bbbb2/SB0336.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/e/6/18e6d086/SB0336.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/e/d/67ed487c/SB0336.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/a/2/e6a28f8c/SB0336.04.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/1/1/a011a4d2/SB0336.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/c/c/27ccea0c/SB0336.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/8/4/be845dfe/SB0336.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/3/8/743823d3/SB0336.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/7/0/7670f604/SB0336.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/9/a/069a0857/SB0336.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/4/3/2a43a90b/SB0336.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/e/6/ebe6c474/SB0336.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/c/d/50cd1aa9/SB0336.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/d/5/97d5321d/SB0336.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/3/0/aa308d51/SB0336.03.COMH.DIS01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/7/3/967323d5/SB0336.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/1/7/8e17a826/SB0336.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/2/c/af2c109a/SB0336.58_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/a/d/f0adf249/SB0336.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/4/7/b147abf2/SB0336.310_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/1/e/c21e14a3/SB0336.341_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/8/a/db8a6b90/SB0336.478_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/4/4/5e445251/SB0336.470_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback