IN SB0333 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - Placed back on second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - Placed back on second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the plans, specifications, and contract documents for a public works project may not require bidders, contractors, or subcontractors to enter into or comply with certain agreements with labor organizations. Provides a cause of action to challenge the award of a contract that violates these provisions.
Title
Public works projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-07 | Placed back on second reading | |
2011-01-31 | Amendment 1 (Tallian), failed; | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-11 | Senators Yoder and M. Young added as coauthors | |
2011-01-11 | Senator Kruse added as second author | |
2011-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2011-01-11 | Authored by Senator Walker |