IN SB0332 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - CCR # 1 filed in the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Publication of notice by political subdivisions. Allows a political subdivision, when required by statute to publish a notice two or more times, to make the first publication of notice in a newspaper and any subsequent publications of the notice on the political subdivision's official web site. Provides that a political subdivision does not satisfy the publication requirements by posting a subsequent notice on a social media web site. Requires the political subdivision or contractor that maintains the political subdivision's official web site to provide proof of publication of the notice on the official web site. Requires the Hoosier State Press Association (HSPA) to submit a written report to the legislative council not later than October 1, 2021, with recommendations regarding publication of notices on political subdivision Internet web sites. Requires the legislative council to prepare recommendations for potential legislation: (1) that is consistent with SEA 332-2021; and (2) considering specified goals and the HSPA's recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Publication of notice by political subdivisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2021-04-15SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2021-04-15SenateSenator Niemeyer added as conferee
2021-04-15SenateSenator Lanane removed as conferee
2021-04-14HouseRepresentative McNamara added as conferee
2021-04-14HouseRepresentative Campbell removed as conferee
2021-04-14HouseRepresentative McNamara removed as advisor
2021-04-06SenateSenate advisors appointed: Mrvan and Rogers
2021-04-06SenateSenate conferees appointed: Buck and Lanane
2021-04-05HouseHouse advisors appointed: McNamara, Abbott and Harris
2021-04-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Miller D and Campbell
2021-04-01SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2021-04-01SenateMotion to dissent filed
2021-03-31HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 334: yeas 93, nays 0
2021-03-29HouseAmendment #3 (Campbell) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-29HouseAmendment #2 (Campbell) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseRepresentative Hostettler added as cosponsor
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2021-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-15SenateSenator Messmer added as third author
2021-02-15SenateCosponsor: Representative McNamara
2021-02-15SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Miller D
2021-02-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 112: yeas 39, nays 7
2021-02-11SenateSenator Rogers added as second author
2021-02-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-08SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Buck

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/332/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/b/d/a0bdd981/SB0332.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/3/d/893d1967/SB0332.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/c/a/83ca27b7/SB0332.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/e/7/51e705dd/SB0332.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/c/e/79ce3450/SB0332.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/0/8/13082b07/SB0332.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/3/4/5634525b/SB0332.04.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/1/c/3a1cdcf5/SB0332.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/8/1/f8811700/SB0332.03.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/f/6/d3f6ee38/SB0332.03.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/9/2/2d92b0c0/SB0332.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/c/a/0fca1cd3/SB0332.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/b/4/ffb4e6e3/SB0332.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/5/cd25c7f8/SB0332.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/e/3/dae38a86/SB0332.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/6/2/9862fd20/SB0332.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/5/1/40513889/SB0332.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/1/7/aa17e741/SB0332.04.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/e/2/b9e26bfb/SB0332.04.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/e/6/8fe6711d/SB0332.04.ENGH.DIS01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/8/0/42802cc2/SB0332.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/7/4/b17457f5/SB0332.112_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/6/1/b861725f/SB0332.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/f/c/22fc217f/SB0332.334_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback