IN SB0332 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
Pending: House Employment, Labor and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Wage assignments. Allows a wage assignment for the purchase price of goods and food offered by an employer and sold to the employee for the employee's benefit, use, or consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wage assignments. Allows a wage assignment for the purchase price of goods and food offered by an employer and sold to the employee for the employee's benefit, use, or consumption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2015-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-27SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-27SenateRepresentative Torr added as cosponsor
2015-01-27SenateSenator Buck added as third author
2015-01-27SenateRepresentative Ober added as sponsor
2015-01-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 46, nays 4
2015-01-26SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-22SenateSenator Tallian added as second author
2015-01-22SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-08SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor
2015-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback