IN SB0331 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adult permanent guardianship cases. Provides that, in a proceeding on a petition for adult permanent guardianship, if the court finds that the appointment of a guardian is necessary and the person subject to the guardianship is a "mental defective" under federal law, the court shall transmit to the division of state court administration certain information for transmission to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System maintained by the Federal Bureau of Investigation in accordance with the federal Brady Handgun Violence Prevention Act. Makes corresponding amendments.
Title
Adult permanent guardianship cases. Provides that, in a proceeding on a petition for adult permanent guardianship, if the court finds that the appointment of a guardian is necessary and the person subject to the guardianship is a "mental defective" under federal law, the court shall transmit to the division of state court administration certain information for transmission to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System maintained by the Federal Bureau of Investigation in accordance with the federal Brady Handgun Violence Prevention Act. Makes corresponding amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Washburne |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 32, nays 18 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senators Taylor and Broden added as coauthors |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as second author |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zakas |