IN SB0329 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Flood control district board of commissioners. Provides that the board of commissioners of a flood control district includes: (1) the executive of each town and the executive of each township included in the district (instead of the town executive or the township executive); and (2) one individual appointed by the executive of each town in the district that does not have a works board. Provides that each commissioner of the flood control board, not holding other lucrative elective or appointive office, is entitled to a salary fixed by the board. Provides that the executive of the city petitioning for the establishment of the flood control district shall be the determining vote in the event of a tie.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flood control district board of commissioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenatePublic Law 27
2021-04-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-24HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 296: yeas 94, nays 0
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-15SenateCosponsors: Representatives Ellington, Lauer, Thompson
2021-02-15SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Engleman
2021-02-15SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 46, nays 0
2021-02-11SenateAmendment #1 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-11SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-08SenateSenator Rogers added as third author
2021-02-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-04SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Grooms

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/329/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/9/5/5b951635/SB0329.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/2/c/8f2c76ff/SB0329.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/2/a/032ac69b/SB0329.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/9/3/00938664/SB0329.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/1/e/c51e6fb2/SB0329.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/a/6/caa65fe5/SB0329.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/d/e/f7de35aa/SB0329.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/8/1/8681da17/SB0329.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/c/7/6cc73f23/SB0329.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/e/0/cee01849/SB0329.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/c/a/86ca5889/SB0329.06.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/2/f/9c2fbb3a/SB0329.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/1/5/a9157955/SB0329.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/f/5/40f5973c/SB0329.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/1/3/7f137c18/SB0329.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/a/0/e1a0aeab/SB0329.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/1/2/ae12ff10/SB0329.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/4/6/2e46d215/SB0329.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/6/4/c5649dc5/SB0329.04.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/5/4/9f54e3c8/SB0329.05.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/3/d/003d413e/SB0329.05.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/e/f/e7ef2f20/SB0329.05.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/9/d/c99d5f36/SB0329.06.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/5/d/765dafef/SB0329.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/1/8/df18a661/SB0329.111_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/f/8/5af81935/SB0329.04.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/9/c/d59cf2b2/SB0329.296_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback