IN SB0328 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Sections 191 through 209 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Sections 191 through 209 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to the laws concerning: (1) financial institutions; (2) debt management companies; (3) pawnbrokers; (4) money transmitters; (5) check cashers; (6) persons licensed under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code; (7) first lien mortgage lenders; and (8) rental purchase agreements. Makes various changes to the laws concerning licensing residential mortgage loan creditors and originators to comply with requirements of the federal Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008. Repeals provisions being superseded by this bill. Repeals provisions under the Uniform Consumer Credit Code concerning the following: (1) A definition index. (2) Revocations of certain licenses. Repeals a provision requiring the display of a license by a debt management company. Repeals a provision concerning reverse mortgage loans made by savings associations and replaces the provision with requirements for reverse mortgage loans made by creditors in first lien mortgage transactions.
Title
Various financial institutions matters.
Sponsors
Sen. James Lewis [D] | Sen. Allen Paul [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Sections 191 through 209 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 190 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 185 through 189 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 184 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 176 through 183 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 174 through 175 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 137 through 173 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 136 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 115 through 135 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 112 through 114 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 97 through 111 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 96 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 69 through 95 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 68 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 33 through 67 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Section 32 effective 03/12/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Sections 1 through 31 effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 35 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 251: Yeas 95, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Burton | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Bardon | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 2 (Paul), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Lewis added as second author | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Lewis removed as coauthor | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Lewis added as coauthor | |
2010-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Paul |