IN SB0327 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Public Law 253
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Charity gaming. Provides that the prize for a progressive bingo game may not exceed $2,000. Provides that the total prizes for one pull tab, punchboard, or tip board game may not exceed $10,000. (Current law provides that the total prizes may not exceed $5,000.) Provides that the prize limit for a game using a seal card is $1,000 and a progressive or carryover pull tab game is $5,000. Requires that a qualified organization may pay for licensed supplies only with a check drawn on or by an electronic funds transfer from the qualified organization's gaming account. Provides that a licensed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charity gaming. Provides that the prize for a progressive bingo game may not exceed $2,000. Provides that the total prizes for one pull tab, punchboard, or tip board game may not exceed $10,000. (Current law provides that the total prizes may not exceed $5,000.) Provides that the prize limit for a game using a seal card is $1,000 and a progressive or carryover pull tab game is $5,000. Requires that a qualified organization may pay for licensed supplies only with a check drawn on or by an electronic funds transfer from the qualified organization's gaming account. Provides that a licensed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-08SenatePublic Law 253
2015-05-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-21HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2015-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-14HouseRepresentative Hamm added as cosponsor
2015-04-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 438: yeas 83, nays 12
2015-04-13HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-04-09HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-09SenateRepresentative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
2015-02-09SenateRepresentative Dermody added as sponsor
2015-02-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 34, nays 15
2015-02-05SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-02-05SenateAmendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-27SenateSenator Arnold added as third author
2015-01-12SenateSenator Alting added as second author
2015-01-08SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2015-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Leising

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/327/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/8/e/038e7635/SB0327.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/6/5/6065810a/SB0327.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/1/2/3812b580/SB0327.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/1/2/0a12b65f/SB0327.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/b/d/b3bdfd39/SB0327.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/5/0/435085df/SB0327.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/8/9/36895ac5/SB0327.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/5/d/935de873/SB0327.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/2/9/aa29ff62/SB0327.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/e/b/feeb0872/SB0327.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/6/5/2d65359c/SB0327.108.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/f/b/6ffb430e/SB0327.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/6/2/8c626864/SB0327.438.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback