IN SB0326 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State board of accounts examinations. Permits the state board of accounts to determine the frequency with which the state board of accounts conducts financial examinations based on risk based criteria approved by the audit and financial reporting subcommittee of the legislative council. Specifies that certain examinations by the state board of accounts may (rather than must, under current law) be made without notice. Indicates that the results of an examination of the state board of accounts are confidential until approved and released for publication by the state examiner. Permits disclosure under certain circumstances. Provides that the state board of accounts
Title
State board of accounts examinations. Permits the state board of accounts to determine the frequency with which the state board of accounts conducts financial examinations based on risk based criteria approved by the audit and financial reporting subcommittee of the legislative council. Specifies that certain examinations by the state board of accounts may (rather than must, under current law) be made without notice. Indicates that the results of an examination of the state board of accounts are confidential until approved and released for publication by the state examiner. Permits disclosure under certain circumstances. Provides that the state board of accounts
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. John Broden [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second author |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Representative Lehman added as sponsor |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 70: yeas 43, nays 1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |