IN SB0325 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Homestead standard deduction. Specifies the requirements and the real property improvements considered when determining whether property is a dwelling or a homestead for purposes of the standard property tax deduction law. Removes additional definitions of "homestead" from the statute. Specifies that for purposes of the circuit breaker law "nonresidential real property" refers to real property that is not: (1) a homestead; (2) residential property; (3) long term care property; or (4) agricultural land. Provides that, for assessment dates after December 31, 2023, "residential property" includes any other land, building, or residential yard structure, including a deck, patio, gazebo, or pool that is not attached to a dwelling that: (1) is not part of a homestead; and (2) is predominantly used for a residential purpose. Makes a conforming change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead standard deduction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04SenatePublic Law 182
2023-05-04SenateSigned by the Governor
2023-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2023-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2023-04-20SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 462: yeas 37, nays 9
2023-04-19SenateMotion to concur filed
2023-04-18HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2023-04-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 432: yeas 97, nays 1
2023-04-13HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2023-04-13HouseAmendment #3 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
2023-04-12HousePlaced back on second reading
2023-04-11HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2023-04-11HouseAmendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed; voice vote
2023-04-11HouseAmendment #2 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
2023-04-06HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2023-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2023-02-28SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2023-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Thompson
2023-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 41, nays 8
2023-02-27SenateSenator Rogers added as third author
2023-02-27SenateSenator Gaskill added as second author
2023-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2023-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Buchanan) prevailed; voice vote
2023-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2023-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Buchanan

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback