IN SB0325 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 04/28/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 04/28/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the Indiana gaming commission's regulation of local development agreements.
Title
Local development agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 04/28/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 82 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-19 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 380: yeas 48, nays 0 | |
2011-04-11 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2011-04-08 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-08 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 440: yeas 87, nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Representative Davis added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-07 | Representative McMillin added as sponsor | |
2011-04-07 | Representative McMillin removed as cosponsor | |
2011-04-07 | Representative Davis removed as sponsor | |
2011-04-07 | Amendment 3 (McMillin), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-07 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2011-02-17 | Cosponsor: Rep. McMillin | |
2011-02-17 | House sponsor: Rep. Davis | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-17 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 43 and nays 7 | |
2011-02-15 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-11 | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor | |
2011-01-10 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2011-01-10 | Coauthored by Senator Kruse | |
2011-01-10 | Authored by Senators Banks and Delph |