IN SB0324 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Micro market and vending machine fees. Provides that the annual permit fee for a micro market shall not exceed $60. Provides that the annual permit fee for a vending machine shall not exceed $8. Specifies that a political subdivision may not charge an installation fee for a micro market or vending machine. Provides that any provision of an ordinance, measure, enactment, rule, or policy or exercise of proprietary authority by a political subdivision or an employee or agent of a political subdivision acting in an official capacity that modifies or conflicts with the statutory requirements concerning: (1) annual micro market permit fees; (2) annual vending machine permit fees; or (3) micro market or vending machine installation fees; is void. Specifies that the annual renewal date for micro market and vending machine permit fees is June 1. Allows the person or entity responsible for the annual collection of micro market and vending machine permit fees to adjust or pro rate, as applicable, a micro market or vending machine permit fee for the purpose of synchronizing micro market and vending machine renewal cycles. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Micro market and vending machine fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. David Abbott [R] |
Rep. Alan Morrison [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Morrison added as cosponsor |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Abbott |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 32, nays 16 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Kruse removed as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Glick |