IN SB0324 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Construction permits and regulation. Provides the following: (1) Provides deadlines for the state department of health (department) to issue construction permits and conduct plan reviews for certain projects. (2) Requires the department to issue a construction permit without further review, if the department fails to provide notice or a complete plan review within the time required by statute. (3) Allows a person to apply for a construction permit from the department and a design release from the division of fire and building safety (division) by submitting a single application to the division. (4) Limits subsequent reviews to revisions and required
Title
Construction permits and regulation. Provides the following: (1) Provides deadlines for the state department of health (department) to issue construction permits and conduct plan reviews for certain projects. (2) Requires the department to issue a construction permit without further review, if the department fails to provide notice or a complete plan review within the time required by statute. (3) Allows a person to apply for a construction permit from the department and a design release from the division of fire and building safety (division) by submitting a single application to the division. (4) Limits subsequent reviews to revisions and required
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] |
Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 49 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 395: yeas 84, nays 7 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 360: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-02-25 | House | House advisors appointed: Nisly and DeLaney |
2016-02-25 | House | House conferees appointed: VanNatter and Stemler |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Yoder, Broden and Perfect |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Messmer and Arnold J |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 93, nays 6 |
2016-02-22 | House | Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; voice vote |
2016-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Clere and Stemler |
2016-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative VanNatter |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as third author |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as second author |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |