IN SB0323 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 223
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Parenting time. Authorizes a court to require a parent to submit to drug testing as a condition of exercising parenting time rights if the court finds that: (1) the parent has a history of unlawful drug use within the previous five years; or (2) there is a reasonable likelihood that the parent is currently using unlawful drugs. Specifies that the parent shall pay the costs of the drug testing. Provides that, if a court grants parenting time to a person who has been convicted of: (1) child molesting; or (2) child exploitation; within the previous five years, the court shall order that the parenting time must be supervised.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parenting time. Authorizes a court to require a parent to submit to drug testing as a condition of exercising parenting time rights if the court finds that: (1) the parent has a history of unlawful drug use within the previous five years; or (2) there is a reasonable likelihood that the parent is currently using unlawful drugs. Specifies that the parent shall pay the costs of the drug testing. Provides that, if a court grants parenting time to a person who has been convicted of: (1) child molesting; or (2) child exploitation; within the previous five years, the court shall order that the parenting time must be supervised.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 223
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-09HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 420: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-04-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-01HouseRepresentatives Torr and Dvorak added as cosponsors
2019-04-01HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateCosponsor: Representative Frye
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cherry
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-02-25SenateSenator Zay added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateSenators Glick, Koch, Freeman, Buck, Rogers added as coauthors
2019-02-21SenateSenators Lanane and Bohacek added as coauthors
2019-02-21SenateSenator Head added as third author
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-07SenateAuthored by Senators Crider and Young M

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/323/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/3/7/60378ee3/SB0323.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/9/f/979f4436/SB0323.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/7/5/8475a9f6/SB0323.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/7/0/8570b13c/SB0323.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/4/a/3c4af864/SB0323.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/1/b/6b1bdd2d/SB0323.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/9/0/16909d94/SB0323.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/c/e/1dce91e9/SB0323.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/9/1/5191dde8/SB0323.227.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/e/b/6beb1861/SB0323.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/b/5/44b5b28a/SB0323.420.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback