IN SB0323 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Waste blood specimen requirements. Adds retention and destruction requirements to the state department of health's epidemiological survey and research system for waste blood specimens. Specifies consent required under certain circumstances concerning waste blood specimens. Allows a parent to request that the waste blood specimen of a newborn be destroyed not later than six months after collection. Requires a fee to be assessed for certain people applying to use samples of the waste blood specimens. Specifies when identifiable information of waste blood specimens can be released, and sets forth requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waste blood specimen requirements. Adds retention and destruction requirements to the state department of health's epidemiological survey and research system for waste blood specimens. Specifies consent required under certain circumstances concerning waste blood specimens. Allows a parent to request that the waste blood specimen of a newborn be destroyed not later than six months after collection. Requires a fee to be assessed for certain people applying to use samples of the waste blood specimens. Specifies when identifiable information of waste blood specimens can be released, and sets forth requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Family & Children Services - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2015-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-09SenateRepresentative Friend added as sponsor
2015-02-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 107: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-02-05SenateAmendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-02SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2015-02-02SenateSenator Grooms added as second author
2015-01-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-26SenateSenator Becker and Kruse added as coauthor
2015-01-08SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Family & Children Services
2015-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback