IN SB0323 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the county fiscal body from the school referendum levy process. Provides that the county fiscal body is not required to certify the referendum question. Requires the language of the question for a school referendum tax levy to be approved by the department of local government finance before it may be certified to the circuit court clerk. Repeals a superseded provision.
Title
School referendum levy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-01-31 | Cosponsor: Rep. Leonard | |
2011-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Heuer | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2011-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 47 and nays 2 | |
2011-01-27 | Amendment 2 (Banks), prevailed; | |
2011-01-27 | Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-25 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | Placed back on second reading | |
2011-01-24 | Amendment 1 (Banks), prevailed; | |
2011-01-24 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Senator Broden added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-10 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-10 | Authored by Senators Banks and Kruse |