IN SB0322 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - House advisors appointed: Dermody, McMillin and Dvorak
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for certain tort immunities pertaining to governmental entities and public employees for employees of the department of correction (DOC) who provide: (1) monitoring services; or (2) sex offender treatment; for certain offenders. Provides that a governmental entity or government employee is not liable if a loss results from an injury to a person or property of an individual who is on parole. Provides that a law enforcement officer (officer) acting within the scope of the officer's employment is not liable if a loss results when the officer provides roadside assistance to a motorist whose motor vehicle is disabled.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tort immunity for DOC employees and motorist assistance by law enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-01 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 House advisors appointed: Dermody, McMillin and Dvorak
2012-03-06 House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Pierce
2012-03-05 Senate advisors appointed: Steele, Taylor and Buck
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Tomes and Hume
2012-03-05 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-03-01 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-03-01 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 320: yeas 96, nays 1
2012-02-29 Amendment 1 (Pelath), withdrawn
2012-02-29 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-28 Representative Speedy added as cosponsor
2012-02-21 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2012-01-31 Senator Buck added as third author
2012-01-31 House sponsor: Rep. Steuerwald
2012-01-31 Referred to the House
2012-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 48 and nays 2
2012-01-26 Senator Steele added as second author
2012-01-26 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-25 Senator Hume added as coauthor
2012-01-23 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2012-01-09 Authored by Senator Tomes

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback