IN SB0313 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House advisors appointed: Barnes, Moses, Koch and Frizzell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - House advisors appointed: Barnes, Moses, Koch and Frizzell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to adopt emergency rules amending the IURC's net metering and interconnection rules for electric utilities. Provides that the amended rules must: (1) make net metering available to all customer classes; (2) allow a net metering customer to interconnect to an electric utility's distribution facility a generating system that is sized to meet all or part of a customer's electric load; (3) allow a net metering customer to interconnect a generating facility that makes use of specified technologies; and (4) allow for customer meter aggregation. Provides that a rule adopted by the IURC to amend the IURC's net metering and interconnection rules may not make the net metering and interconnection rules apply to a cooperatively owned power supplier or a municipally owned utility. Provides that the existing rules are void to the extent they do not comply with the requirements for the amended rules. Requires the IURC to report to the regulatory flexibility committee on the IURC's progress in adopting the amended rules. Requires the IURC to include certain information in its annual report to the regulatory flexibility committee regarding the number of net metering customers, any safety incidents, and the cross subsidy impact of net metering to other ratepayers of each electric utility. Renewable electricity standard. Requires an electricity supplier to supply at least 4% of its electricity generated through wind power not later than December 31, 2014. Establishes the renewable energy resources fund to receive penalties paid by electricity suppliers that fail to supply electricity from renewable energy resources. Appropriates money in the fund.
Title
Net metering; renewable electricity standard.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Rep. Sue Errington [D] | Sen. Beverly Gard [R] |
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Marlin Stutzman [R] | Sen. Richard Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | House advisors appointed: Barnes, Moses, Koch and Frizzell | |
2010-03-01 | House conferees appointed: Dvorak and Lutz | |
2010-03-01 | Senate advisors appointed: Gard, Charbonneau, Errington and R. Young | |
2010-03-01 | Senate conferees appointed: Merritt and Breaux | |
2010-03-01 | Senate dissented from House amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 249: Yeas 68, Nays 31 | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-22 | Representative Barnes added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-22 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Representative Koch added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Energy, Technology and Utilities | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Charbonneau added as third author | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Lutz | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Dvorak | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: Yeas 49 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Breaux added as coauthor | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Stutzman added as coauthor | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Gard added as second author | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Gard removed as coauthor | |
2010-01-28 | Senator Errington added as coauthor | |
2010-01-28 | Senator R. Young added as coauthor | |
2010-01-28 | Amendment 11 (Broden), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-28 | Amendment 7 (Tallian), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-28 | Amendment 3 (Breaux), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-28 | Amendment 9 (Errington), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-28 | Amendment 2 (Merritt), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-28 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-21 | Senator Gard added as coauthor | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Merritt |