IN SB0312 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a person who wins a prize payable in installments from the lottery commission may assign the future prize payments under certain circumstances upon court approval. Sets forth requirements for a court order approving a prize payment assignment. Requires that a petition to assign a prize payment must be served upon the lottery commission's director and the child support bureau. Requires the assignee to provide certain information. Requires the director of the lottery commission to investigate and certify whether a person who petitions for a lottery prize payment assignment has or has not satisfied debts to state agencies. Provides that if the Internal Revenue Service, the department of state revenue, or a court issues a determination or ruling that the voluntary assignment of a prize payment will affect federal income tax treatment, the commission shall file the determination or ruling with the attorney general's office and the Indiana judicial center, and a court may not issue a voluntary assignment of a prize payment after the date of the determination or ruling. Adds the department of child services to the list of agencies that must identify to the commission individuals who owe past due child support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assignment of lottery prizes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 031204 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 031202 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 031201 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27SenatePublic Law 198
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-10SenateMotion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 376: yeas 42 and nays 0
2014-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-03-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 356: yeas 96 and nays 0
2014-02-27HouseSB 312 Amendment #1 (McMillin), prevailed.
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-17HouseRepresentative Dermody added as cosponsor.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Public Policy
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative DeLaney added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative McMillin added sponsor.
2014-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 178: yeas 46 and nays 2
2014-02-03SenateSenator Holdman added as second author.
2014-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-02-03SenateSB 312 Amendment #2 (Head), prevailed.
2014-02-03SenateSB 312 Amendment #1 (Head), prevailed.
2014-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-27SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor.
2014-01-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Appropriations
2014-01-14SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Judiciary
2014-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Head.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/312/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/b/1/47b1bcb9/SB0312.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/5/7/3757078b/SB0312.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/c/8/e5c8acb5/SB0312.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/e/7/7ce722c8/SB0312.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/c/c/b2ccb1ee/SB0312.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/5/6/9c56c585/SB0312.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/3/7/7d373ada/SB0312.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/d/e/e4de6695/SB0312.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/4/0/764016fd/SB0312.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/3/3/e033dbf1/SB0312.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/c/d/f9cd9e0a/SB0312.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/e/a/e5ea60b5/SB0312.06.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/c/a/e2ca5bb7/SB0312.07.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/8/d/b68dd54b/SB0312.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/b/7/4bb7ad43/SB0312.04.COMS.178.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/7/e/837e3515/SB0312.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/5/f/cb5fb832/SB0312.04.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/5/7/be57d9af/SB0312.06.ENGH.356.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/a/9/54a99821/SB0312.06.ENGH.376.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback