IN SB0312 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Representatives Porter and Truitt added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Representatives Porter and Truitt added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Indiana safe schools fund to be used to provide educational outreach and training to school personnel concerning the identification and prevention of and intervention in criminal gang activity. Requires the Indiana department of education (department) to develop model educational materials and a model policy concerning criminal gang activity. Requires the department, in collaboration with the Indiana criminal justice institute, the Indiana department of child services, and any organization with expertise in criminal gang education, prevention, and intervention that the department determines to be appropriate, to identify or develop model education materials and develop a model policy to address criminal gangs and criminal gang activity in schools. Requires the governing body of each school corporation, including Indianapolis public schools and charter schools, to develop and maintain a criminal gang policy. Requires a school corporation to include a copy of its criminal gang policy: (1) on its web site; (2) in school student handbooks; and (3) in any location the school corporation determines to be appropriate. Requires each school corporation to develop: (1) an educational criminal gang awareness program for students, school employees, and parents; and (2) a school employee development program to provide training to school employees in the implementation of the school corporation's criminal gang policy. Authorizes a school corporation to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the county prosecutor or a juvenile court to foster coordination of gang prevention, intervention, and suppression efforts. Requires, beginning in 2015 and each year thereafter, each school corporation to submit a report to the department outlining the activities undertaken by the school corporation to address criminal gang activity. Requires, beginning in 2015 and each year thereafter, the department to submit a report to the governor and the general assembly. Requires the discipline rules adopted by the governing body of a school corporation to: (1) prohibit criminal gang activity; and (2) include provisions concerning education, parental involvement, reporting, investigation, and intervention concerning criminal gang activity. Requires a school employee who has reason to believe that a student or school employee: (1) actively participates in a criminal gang; (2) commits criminal gang intimidation; or (3) solicits, recruits, entices, or intimidates another individual to join a criminal gang; to immediately notify the school or school corporation administration. Requires the principal to make an oral report to the local law enforcement agency. Provides that an individual who makes a report or causes a report to be made or who participates in any judicial proceeding resulting from or relating to the report is immune from any civil or criminal liability if the individual did not act maliciously or in bad faith. Makes a technical correction.
Title
School policies on gang activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | Representatives Porter and Truitt added as cosponsors | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsor: Rep. Klinker | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. T. Brown | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Head added as second author | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Rogers added as coauthor | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 2 (Hershman), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-01-05 | Authored by Senator Hershman |