IN SB0311 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Use of force and self defense. Prohibits a state or local law enforcement officer (officer) from firing warning shots. Allows a guard, official, or officer in a state or local penal facility to fire warning shots to prevent the escape of a person. Prohibits a law enforcement agency or merit board from taking an adverse employment action against a law enforcement officer who lawfully exercises the officer's right of self defense, and requires a law enforcement agency to indemnify a law enforcement officer for reasonable expenses incurred by the officer in successfully contesting an adverse employment action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of force and self defense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bartels
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 40, nays 8
2021-02-22SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Baldwin) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-11SenateCoauthored by Senators Koch, Doriot, Rogers
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senators Baldwin, Sandlin, Garten

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/311/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/3/b/8d3b8e3f/SB0311.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/e/d/56ed1cf0/SB0311.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/f/d/96fd4f25/SB0311.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/2/8/d728f524/SB0311.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/3/4/ac34f576/SB0311.03.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/b/4/e5b48e9e/SB0311.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/7/f/007fd998/SB0311.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/6/7/6667103c/SB0311.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/d/3/7fd3114b/SB0311.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/f/d/a6fdb2a1/SB0311.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/f/9/e2f9f564/SB0311.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/3/d/173df3ad/SB0311.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/9/d/b39de8a5/SB0311.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/2/8/5b286d4e/SB0311.188_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback