IN SB0311 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Coverage for PANDAS and PANS. Requires a state employee health plan, a policy of accident and sickness insurance, and a health maintenance organization contract to provide coverage for pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections (PANDAS) and pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome (PANS), including treatment with intravenous immunoglobulin therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coverage for PANDAS and PANS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Kirchhofer and Wright
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bauer
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 40, nays 9
2020-02-03SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-28SenateSenator Ford Jon added as coauthor
2020-01-23SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor
2020-01-23SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2020-01-23SenateSenator Bohacek removed as coauthor
2020-01-16SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2020-01-13SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-01-13SenateAuthored by Senator Niezgodski

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback