IN SB0307 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 227
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Consumer protection. Amends the statute concerning telephone solicitations of consumers (Indiana's "do not call" law) to provide that a person may not provide substantial assistance or support to a telephone solicitor, a supplier, or a caller if the person knows or consciously avoids knowing that the telephone solicitor, supplier, or caller has violated the "do not call" law or the statute concerning the regulation of automatic dialing machines. Specifies that a communications service provider: (1) does not violate this prohibition; and (2) is not subject to any criminal penalties or civil remedies set forth in the "do not call" law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer protection. Amends the statute concerning telephone solicitations of consumers (Indiana's "do not call" law) to provide that a person may not provide substantial assistance or support to a telephone solicitor, a supplier, or a caller if the person knows or consciously avoids knowing that the telephone solicitor, supplier, or caller has violated the "do not call" law or the statute concerning the regulation of automatic dialing machines. Specifies that a communications service provider: (1) does not violate this prohibition; and (2) is not subject to any criminal penalties or civil remedies set forth in the "do not call" law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce & Technology - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenatePublic Law 227
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-28SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 517: yeas 48, nays 0
2015-04-27HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 542: yeas 89, nays 3
2015-04-21HouseRepresentative DeLaney removed as advisor
2015-04-21HouseRepresentative Dvorak added as advisor
2015-04-20HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Cox and DeLaney
2015-04-20HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Forestal
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Glick, Broden and Buck
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Bray and Randolph
2015-04-20SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-16SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 448: yeas 97, nays 0
2015-04-14HouseAmendment #1 (Forestal) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14HouseAmendment #2 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-14HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-13HouseRepresentative Forestal added as cosponsor
2015-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2015-01-26SenateRepresentative Steuerwald added as sponsor
2015-01-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 33: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-20SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-20SenateSenators Merritt, Tomes, Delph, Houchin added as coauthors
2015-01-20SenateSenator Glick added as second author
2015-01-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-13SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2015-01-08SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology
2015-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/307/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/1/4/6b14f30f/SB0307.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/4/8/a248b089/SB0307.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/0/9/4909075b/SB0307.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/7/b/427b1167/SB0307.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/8/3/af8303ac/SB0307.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/1/b/8b1b364a/SB0307.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/a/0/9fa05156/SB0307.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/1/d/6d1dcaca/SB0307.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/a/c/05ac1300/SB0307.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/2/6/87261f40/SB0307.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/1/8/b818e343/SB0307.33.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/c/5/d0c5b66a/SB0307.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/2/8/e8286ef6/SB0307.448.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/b/7/6db77d60/SB0307.542.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/1/5/2615139b/SB0307.517.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback